Our History
Indian Hill Baptist Church, located just outside Bluffton,
South Carolina, on Highway 278 (Fording Island Road), began as
a center for both worship and education in the 1880's.
The original building, completed in 1885, rested on land given
by Elijah Padgett. In those early days the Reverend
Peter Hoitt held services once a month. Also, the
building was used as a school seven months each year. Hiott's
brother, Mallard, taught school there. At some later time,
a second building was constructed on the site to be used exclusively
for a school. It has disappeared, and what happened to
it is uncertain.
Some families active in the Church during the 1880's were:
Bodderfords, Smiths, Padgetts, Hudsons, Hutsons, Hiotts, Bentons,
Prochers, Dowlings, Stones, and Coolers. Many of today's
members are direct descendants of these.
Early pastors to serve Indian Hill were Reverend Stoney (first
name unknown), Reverend Alex Peterson, Reverend George Hutson,
Reverend Robert Moore, and Reverend George Harris.
In 1940 a storm damaged the building so badly that services
were not held in it for more than a decade. Mrs. W. E.
(Lucy) Smith moved back into the area in the early 1950's and
began to seek help from friends and family to restore the building
and began services again. With the Reverend Lester Cook
as pastor, the first service of the new church was held Easter
Sunday, 1957. The church became affiliated with the Savannah
River Baptist Association that year. There were 64 members.
Reverend Cook was Pastor until 1959, followed by were Reverend
T.J. Cribb (1961-1962), Reverend Ed Vaughn (1963), And Roy Corum
(1965). Supply pastors served the church during part of
the years 1960, 1964, and 1966.
J. J. Whalen sold 1.32 acres of land to the Church for the
sum of $1.00 on the 25th day of May, 1961.
In October, 1966, Reverend Harold P. Greene held three prayer
meetings in the old Church in an attempt to get it re-opened
to full time service. Again in April, 1967, attempts were
made to reopen the Church by Reverend C. L. Hanshew, Director
of Missions for the Savannah River Association. An invitation
to become Pastor was extended to Reverend Harold P. Greene in
June, 1967, and Reverend Greene became Pastor. The Church
was renovated and reopened with about 65 members.
Fund-raising activities such as barbecues and many individual
donations resulted in construction of a new sanctuary in 1973.
The new sanctuary seated 300 and contained several Sunday School
rooms. Church membership in 1976 was 290.
Mary Beebe Beasley sold 2.05 acres to the Church for the sum
of $5.00 on March 28, 1973.
Reverend Greene served until 1980.
Reverend Bill Pritchett and then Reverend Jimmy Gunner followed,
who served from January 8, 1984 through June 30, 1985.
The members converted the old church building into a parsonage
for Reverend Gunner and his family. Since Reverend Gunner's
service, the building has been used for Sunday School rooms,
educational, and fellowship meetings. In 1987 the building
was dedicated as the Alton Farmer Educational Building in appreciation
for the faithfulness and hard work of this deacon.
Reverend Ken Jernigan (who served as interim Pastor starting
July 7, 1985), was called to full pastorate on August 18, 1985.
Reverend Kirby Bunton, Reverend Mark Hornsby, and Reverend Stan
Stones were pastors that served during the following years.
In March 1995, the Church, feeling the need for a full-time
pastor, stepped out on faith and called Reverend Ed Hayes as
Indian Hill's first full time pastor. A building program
was created to add a 8,800 square foot educational building which
included 10 Sunday School rooms, a large fellowship hall, a full
service kitchen, church offices, and additional restroom facilities.
Funds have been raised by various ventures: yard sales, spaghetti
dinners, barbecues, and donations. In 1996, Pastor Ed was
diagnosed with Lou Gehrig's disease and yet continued to lead
and serve the Church until he became Pastor Emeritus in May 2001.
The educational building was dedicated in honor of Pastor Emeritus
Ed Hayes in November 2001.
Reverend Guy Boyd was called as pastor in June 2001 and served
as pastor until August 2006. During Reverend Guy Boyd's tenure
the new facilities were finished, a professional video and sound
system was installed, the church website was created and the
grounds were professionally landscaped.
Tim Rich assumed the role of interim pastor on August 20,
2006 and served in that position through December of 2007.
Reverend Doug Ludlam was called as pastor on August 3, 2008.