Historical Division, Virtual Squad
Commanders of the HG Panzer Division, from 1933-1945
Picture of Oberst of LP Wecke taken from Hermann Göring: From Regiment to Fallschirmpanzerkorps, by Roger James Bender and George A. Petersen.
Major der Schutzpolizei Wecke, commanded from February 23, 1933 to June 5, 1934.
Picture of Oberstleutnant F.W. Jakoby taken from Hermann Göring: From Regiment to Fallschirmpanzerkorps, by Roger James Bender and George A. Petersen.
Oberstleutnant Jakoby commanded from June 6, 1934 until August 21, 1936.
Picture of Walther V. Axthelm taken from Hermann Göring: From Regiment to Fallschirmpanzerkorps, by Roger James Bender and George A. Petersen
Oberst von Axthelm commanded from August 22, 1936 until May 31, 1940.
Picture of Generalmajor Paul Conrath taken from The History of the Fallschirmpanzerkorps Hermann Göring, by Franz Kurowski
Generalmajor Conrath commanded from June 1, 1940 until April 15, 1944.
Picture of Generalmajor Wilhelm Schmalz taken from Hermann Göring: From Regiment to Fallschirmpanzkerops, by Roger James Bender and George A. Petersen.
Generalmajor Schmalz commanded from April 16, 1944 until the end of the war.
|