Commanding Officers of Q 43 Candido de Lasala
Commanding
Officers of ARA (Q 43) Candido de Lasala List compiled |
|||
From |
To |
Rank |
Name |
25 March 1970 | 09 March 1971 | Commander | Luis Enrique Badaroux |
09 March 1971 | 14 December 1971 | Commander | Ruben Jacinto Chamarro |
14 December 1971 | 15 February 1973 | Commander | Alberto Oscar Casellas |
15 February 1973 | 21 February 1974 | Commander | Hector Antonio Terranova |
21 February 1974 | 19 March 1975 | Commander | Enrique F. Donadini |
19 March 1975 | 11 June 1975 | Commander | Raul Sotelo |
11 June 1975 | 02 February 1976 | Commander | Salvio O. Menendez |
02 February 1976 | 19 July 1976 | Commander | Hugo Piantanida |
19 July 1976 | 28 December 1976 | Commander | Gustavo Grunschlager |
28 December 1976 | 06 July 1977 | Commander | Pedro La Plaza |
06 July 1977 | 06 January 1978 | Commander | Mario H.A. Brusa |
06 January 1978 | 13 February 1979 | Commander | Carlos E. Rucci |
13 February 1979 | 30 January 1980 | Commander | Emilio A. Bianchi |
30 January 1980 | 14 April 1981 | Commander | Oscar R. Padilla |