The Soo Water Department1200 E. Easterday |
Gordon (Bud) Clarke the former Superintendent of water, sewer, parks and recreation, and the cemetery; retired in June of 1998 after working 43 years for the City. | ||
Jim Moreau is Water Distribution and Sewer Superintendent; and also Superintendent of the Water Filtration Plant. | ||
John Kellis is the Head Meterman and has worked for the city since June 17, 1974. Johns main duties are turning on and off water for seasonal customers. Repair, test and change of meters. Locate water lines for Miss Dig, inspecting new construction for meter locations, wiring houses for remote reading devices, and working on broken water mains. | ||
Bill Kellis is the Water Dist. Tech and has been employed at the city since September 3, 1974. He is second in command in the water department. Bill is very knowledgeable in all things that the water department does, and does them. Unlike the other employees in the department, he has spent his entire career in the water department. | ||
Tim Pace is a pipefitter, and he has worked for the city since June 1st 1987. Tim's duties include install and repair of hydrants, repairing broken water mains, locating mains for Miss Dig, repair leaking service lines, thawing frozen services and any other job required. | ||
Harry Killips is a Pipefitter and has been employed by the city since July 6, 1976. Harry installs and repairs hydrants, makes new water taps for customers, repairs leaking service lines and broken water mains, thawing frozen services and any other duty required. |
[
Sign my GuestBook ] - [ Read
my GuestBook
]
[ GuestBook by TheGuestBook.com ]
Sault Ste. Marie Time and Temp |
Get a free home page at Angelfire. |
||
.
|