Unit | Components | Aircraft | Base | Arrived from | Arrived | Departed | Departed to | Trained for (if WWII) | Notes | ||||
1st | Bomb Group | 11th | Aero Squadron | DH-4B | Biggs | Ellington Field, TX | Jun 16, 1919 | Jun 30, 1926 | Formed at Ft Bliss. Became the 1st Surveillance Group Nov 5, 1920 | ||||
12th | Aero Squadron | DH-4B | France post WWI | Jul 7, 1919 | Jun 30, 1926 | ||||||||
20th | Aero Squadron | DH-4B | Kelly AAF, TX | Jun 16, 1919 | Jun 30, 1926 | ||||||||
96th | Aero Squadron | DH-4B | France post WWI | Jul 7, 1919 | Jun 30, 1926 | ||||||||
104th | Aero Squadron | DH-4B | France post WWI | Jul 7, 1919 | Jun 30, 1926 | ||||||||
3rd | Bomb Group | 8th | Bomb Squadron | DH-4B | Biggs | Kelly Field, TX | Nov 12, 1919 | Jul 2, 1921 | Kelly Field, TX | ||||
12th | Bomb Squadron | DH-4B | |||||||||||
13th | Bomb Squadron | DH-4B | |||||||||||
8th | Airship Company | C-1, C-2, USZD-1 | Biggs | Brooks Field, TX | Nov 15, 1919 | Jun 30, 1926 | Scott Field, IL | ||||||
20th | Fighter Group | 55th | Fighter Squadron | P-51 | Biggs | Camp Kilmer, NJ | Jul 29, 1946 | Oct, 1946 | Shaw Field, SC | Postwar | |||
77th | Fighter Squadron | P-51 | |||||||||||
79th | Fighter Squadron | P-51 | |||||||||||
25th | Bomb Group | 12th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | Alamogordo | Borinquen Field, PR | Apr 31, 1944 | June 20, 1944 | Disbanded at Alamogordo | ||||
59th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
417th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
36th | Fighter Group | 22nd | Fighter Squadron | P-47 | Alamogordo | Charleston, SC | Jun 23, 1943 | Sep, 1943 | Scribner AAF, NE | 9th AF | |||
23rd | Fighter Squadron | P-47 | |||||||||||
32nd | Fighter Squadron | P-47 | |||||||||||
53rd | Fighter Squadron | P-47 | |||||||||||
47th | Bomb Group | 84th | Bomb Squadron | A-26 | Biggs | Lake Charles AAF, LA | Oct 20, 1946 | Nov 19, 1948 | Barksdale AFB, LA | Postwar | |||
85th | Bomb Squadron | A-26 | |||||||||||
86th | Bomb Squadron | A-26 | |||||||||||
94th | Bomb Group | 331st | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | Biggs | Davis-Monthan AAF, AZ | Nov 1, 1942 | Jan, 1943 | Pueblo AAF, CO | 8th AF | |||
332nd | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
33rd | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
410th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
95th | Bomb Wing | 334th | Bomb Squadron | B-36, B-52 | Biggs | Formed st Biggs | Jun 4, 1952 | Aug 8, 1966 | Disbanded | Postwar | |||
335th | Bomb Squadron | B-36, B-52 | Jun 4, 1952 |
Jan 15, 1959 |
Bergstrom AFB (4130th SW) |
||||||||
336th | Bomb Squadron | B-36, B-52 | Jun 4, 1952 |
Jul 1, 1959 |
Turner AFB, GA (4138th SW) |
||||||||
917th | Air Refueling Squadron | KC-135 | Dyess AFB, TX (96th BW) | ||||||||||
97th | Bomb Wing | 97th | Air Refueling Squadron | KB-29, KC-97 | Smoky Hill AFB, KS | May 16th, 1948 | Eaker AFB, LA | ||||||
340th | Bomb Squadron | B-29, B-50, B-47 | |||||||||||
341st | Bomb Squadron | B-29, B-50, B-47 | |||||||||||
342nd | Bomb Squadron | B-29, B-50, B-47 | |||||||||||
301st | Bomb Group | 32nd | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | Alamogordo | Geiger Field, WA | May 27, 1942 | Jun 21, 1942 | Richard E. Byrd Field, VA | 15th AF | |||
352nd | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
353rd | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
354th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
419th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
303rd | Bomb Group | 358th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | Alamogordo | Gowen Field, ID | Jun 17, 1942 | Aug 7, 1942 | Biggs AAF, TX | 8th AF | |||
359th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
360th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
427th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
303rd | Bomb Group | B-17 | Biggs | Alamogordo AAF, NM | Aug 7, 1942 | Aug 23, 1942 | Molesworth, England | 8th AF | |||||
330th | Bomb Group | 427th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Salt Lake AAB, UT | Aug 1, 1942 | Apr 5, 1943 | Biggs AAF, TX | ||||
458th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
459th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
460th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
330th | Bomb Group | B-24 | Biggs | Alamogordo AAF, NM | Apr 5, 1943 | Apr 1, 1944 | Walker AAF, KS | Disbanded | |||||
351st | Bomb Group | 508th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | Biggs | Geiger Field, WA | Dec, 1942 | Mar 1, 1943 | Pueblo AAF, CO | 8th AF | |||
509th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
510th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
511th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
362nd | Fighter Group | 377th | Fighter Squadron | P-51 | Biggs | Seymour Johnson Field, SC | Dec 3, 1945 | Aug 1, 1946 | General Billy Mitchell Field, WS | Postwar | |||
378th | Fighter Squadron | P-51 | |||||||||||
379th | Fighter Squadron | P-51 | |||||||||||
380th | Bomb Group | 528th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Biggs | Davis-Monthan AAF, AZ | Dec 2, 1942 | Mar 4, 1943 | Lowry Field, CO | 5th AF | |||
529th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
530th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
531st | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
385th | Bomb Group | 548th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | Biggs | Davis-Monthan AAF, AZ | Dec 21, 1942 | Feb 1, 1943 | Geiger Field, WA | 8th AF | |||
549th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
550th | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
551st | Bomb Squadron | B-17 | |||||||||||
389th | Bomb Group | 564th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Biggs | Davis-Monthan AAF, AZ | Feb 1, 1943 | Apr 19, 1943 | Lowry Field, CO | 8th AF | |||
565th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
566th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
567th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
392nd | Bomb Group | 576th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Biggs | Davis-Monthan AAF, AZ | Mar 1, 1943 | Apr 18, 1943 | Alamogordo AAF, NM | 8th AF | |||
577th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
578th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
579th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
392nd | Bomb Group | Alamogordo | Biggs AAF, TX | Mar 18, 1943 | Jul 18, 1943 | Wendling, England | |||||||
400th | Bomb Group | 608th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Salina, KS | Sep 19, 1943 | Dec 15, 1943 | Charleston AAF, SC | Disbanded | |||
609th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
610th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
611th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
401st | Bomb Group | 612th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Biggs | Brooks Field, TX | Jun 29, 1949 | Jun 25, 1951 | Alexadria AFB, LA | Postwar | Reserve unit | ||
418th | Bomb Group | 696th | Bomb Squadron | Alamogordo | Lake Charles AAF, LA |
Mar 11, 1944 | Apr 1, 1944 | Disbanded, most likely never received aircraft | |||||
697th | Bomb Squadron | ||||||||||||
698th | Bomb Squadron | ||||||||||||
699th | Bomb Squadron | ||||||||||||
449th | Bomb Group | 716th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Davis-Monthan AAF, AZ | Jul 5, 1943 | Sep 12, 1943 | Bruning AAF, NE | 15th AF | |||
717th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
718th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
719th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
450th | Bomb Group | 720th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Clovis AAB, NM | Jul 8, 1943 | Nov 20, 1943 | Manduria, Italy | 15th AF | |||
721st | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
722nd | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
723rd | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
454th | Bomb Group | 736th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Jun 1, 1943 | Jul 1, 1943 | Davis-Monthan AAF, AZ | 15th AF | Formed at Alamogordo | |||
737th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
739th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
739th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
455th | Bomb Group | 740th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Jun 1, 1943 | Sep 6, 1943 | Kearns, UT | 15th AF | Formed at Alamogordo | |||
741st | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
742nd | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
743rd | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
459th | Bomb Group | 756th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Jul 1, 1943 | Aug 31, 1943 | Kearns, UT | 15th AF | Formed at Alamogordo | |||
757th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
758th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
759th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
460th | Bomb Group | 760th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Jul 1, 1943 | Aug 31, 1943 | Kearns, UT | 15th AF | Formed at Alamogordo | |||
761st | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
762nd | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
763rd | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
465th | Bomb Group | 780th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Aug 31, 1943 | Sep, 1943 | Kearns, UT | 15th AF | Formed at Alamogordo | |||
781st | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
782nd | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
783rd | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
466th | Bomb Group | 784th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Kearns, UT | Aug 1, 1943 | Aug 31, 1943 | Kearns, UT | 8th AF | |||
785th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
786th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
787th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
466th | Bomb Group | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Kearns, UT | Nov 24, 1943 | Feb 5, 1944 | Topeka AAF, KS | 8th AF | ||||
467th | Bomb Group | 788th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Aug 25, 1945 | Sep 8, 1947 | Postwar | |||||
789th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
790th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
791st | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
487th | Bomb Group | 836th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Bruning AAF, NE | Dec 15, 1943 | Mar 13,1944 | Lavenham, England | 8th AF | |||
837th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
838th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
839th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
491st | Bomb Group | 852nd | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Biggs | Davis-Monthan AAF, AZ | Oct 1, 1943 | Nov 11, 1943 | North Pickenham, England | 8th AF | Formed at Alamogordo | ||
853rd | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
854th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
855th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
492nd | Bomb Group | 856th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | Alamogordo | Oct 1, 1943 | Apr 1, 1944 | North Pickenham, England | 8th AF | ||||
857th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
858th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
859th | Bomb Squadron | B-24 | |||||||||||
497th | Bomb Group | 869th | Bomb Squadron | B-29 | El Paso Municipal Airport, TX | Nov 20, 1943 | Dec 1, 1943 | Clovis AAF, NM | 20th AF | Formed at El Paso Municipal Airport | |||
870th | Bomb Squadron | B-29 | |||||||||||
871st | Bomb Squadron | B-29 | |||||||||||
872nd | Bomb Squadron | B-29 | |||||||||||
Individual Squadrons | |||||||||||||
1st | Strategic Support Squadron | C-54, C-97, C124 | Biggs | Fort Worth AFB, TX | Dec 21, 1948 | Jan, 1959 | Disbanded | ||||||
35th |
Aviation
Depot Squadron |
None |
Biggs |
||||||||||
431st | Aerial Refueling Squadron | KB-50 | Biggs | Turner AFB, GA | Jul 1, 1959 | Mar 8, 1965 | Disbanded | ||||||
129th | Observation Squadron | B-10 | Biggs | Formed at Biggs | |||||||||
6th | Tow Target Squadron | O-47, A-20, A-24, A-25, T-6, C-45, B-45, B-29, F-80, T-33, A-26, B-26, C-47, L-13, B-57, F-100 | Biggs | 129th OS redesignated | |||||||||
406th | Base Unit | Biggs | 6th TTS redesignated | Dec, 1944 | Deming AAF, NM | ||||||||
27th | Tow Target Squadron | Biggs | Deming AAF (406th BU) | Sep, 1945 | 1947 | Became 1st TTS | |
||||||
1st | Tow Target Squadron | Biggs | 27th TTS Redesignated | 1947 | 1960 | Became 1st ATS | Deactivated Oct, 1949 - May, 1950. | ||||||
1st | Aerial Tracking Squadron | Biggs | 1st TTS Redesignated | 1960 | 1962 | Became 4758th DSES | Aircraft listed are for all eras and constitute only a partial listing. | ||||||
4758th | Defense Systems Evaluation Squadron | Biggs | 1st ATS Redesignated | 1962 | Aug 8, 1966 | Holloman AFB, NM | |||||||
19th |
Tow
Target Squadron |
B-26 |
Biggs |
||||||||||
685th |
Aircraft
Control and Warning Squadron |
None |
Las Cruces,
NM |
Kirtland AFB |
Dec 1, 1954 |
Aug 1, 1963 |
Inactivated | 1 | |||||
Command Units | |||||||||||||
20th | Bombardment Command | Biggs | New York, NY | May 1, 1943 | Oct 6, 1943 | Disbanded | Bomber training | ||||||
16th | Bombardment Operational Training Wing | Biggs | Wendover Field, UT | Nov, 1942 | Jun 1, 1943 | Davis-Monthan AAF, AZ | Responsible for training Heavy Bombardment Units | ||||||
16th | Bombardment Operational Training Wing | Biggs | Davis-Monthan AAF, AZ | Oct, 1941 | Dec, 1945 | Colorado Springs, CO | Responsible for training Very Heavy Bombardment Units | ||||||
810th | Air Division | Biggs | Activated at Biggs | Jun, 1952 | Nov 1, 1962 | Minot AFB, ND | Overall responsibility for units stationed at Biggs AFB | ||||||
810th | Air Base Group | ||||||||||||
Central
Air Rescue Center Detachment 34 |
HH-43B |
Biggs |
Activated at
Biggs |
Oct 1, 1961 |
Summer 1963 |
Deactivated |
|||||||
To
return to:
Comments and suggestion:
Page created 05-17-05
Modified 12-17-19
Clifford Bossie